Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN M HARRIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN M HARRIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISCHARGING THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6171-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22844449
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION Event Code 4132-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22790682
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION OR PETITION TO DISCHARGE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6065-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22790681
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE Event Code 7843-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22763002
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
WAIVER Event Code 6842-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22555703
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE Event Code 4481-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 22555704
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION Event Code 4132-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 22555705
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
WAIVER Event Code 6842-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22555699
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Event Code 6924-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22229382
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.