Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Rawlings Company Llc filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN M HARRIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISCHARGING THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6171-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23566318
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE Event Code 4481-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23357738
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION OR PETITION TO DISCHARGE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE Event Code 10277-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23357799
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS Event Code 6783-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23177623
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23098985
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM Event Code 7321-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21378956
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
CONFIDENTIAL INVENTORY Event Code 7434-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21353499
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE TO CREDITORS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5165-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20524538
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO CREDITORS Event Code 6772-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20437786
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.