Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Snider Carlene, Snider Robert, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Shapiro Peter Adam, Wilson Jonathan D, against Asi Assurance Corp, represented by Wright Jonathan Edward, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERT T BURGER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERT T BURGER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6229-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20527725
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20399325
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20398129
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20381792
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20371519
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20365127
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20367359
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20358954
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20300102
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.