Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with GEORGE B. TURNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGEORGE B. TURNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Non-Homestd 50001-249999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 899-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22603429
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FUNDS DUE TO CLERK OF COURT Event Code 5723-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22594967
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO AMEND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 935-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22594856
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
ASM: REOPEN CIRCUIT MOTION FEE Event Code 61-Event Seq 4
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION DIRECTING CLERK Event Code 2353-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22581986
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID Event Code 6846-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22581988
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22473592
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22473590
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.