Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES G CRAWFORD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES G CRAWFORD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Non-Homestd 50001-249999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24667765
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24667766
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 4
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE BID SHEET Event Code 10020-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 24618628
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24618134
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST Event Code 5219-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24613414
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24491983
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24453623
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.