Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Products Liability case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID DUGAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryProducts Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
|
REQUEST FOR COPIES Event Code 6742-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28739836
Date: April 13, 2018REQUEST FOR COPIES Event Code 6742-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 28739837
Date: April 13, 2018MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL Event Code 2965-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 29314534
Date: August 15, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Event Code 7806-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 29438899
Date: September 14, 2018ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW Event Code 6211-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 29530073
Date: October 05, 2018STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Event Code 5349-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28609490
Date: March 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6209-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32254096
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS Event Code 6670-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32229362
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32195766
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
LACK OF PROSECUTION ELIGIBLE Event Code 5560-Event Seq 1
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 29899513
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.