Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Homestead $50001-$249999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23414475
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23414467
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE BID SHEET Event Code 10020-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 23299208
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23283253
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID Event Code 6846-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23268812
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23234951
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23222633
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.