Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with GEORGE B. TURNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGEORGE B. TURNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Homestead $50001-$249999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
DSB: REFUND BOND Event Code 1124-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: CASE MGMNT CONF CANCELLED Event Code 5738-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIG NOTE/MTG RETD PER ORDER Event Code 4991-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL MTG DOCS TO BE RETD Event Code 10109-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW Event Code 6211-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23458462
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 4
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW Event Code 2769-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23458427
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 23432488
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.