Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLISA DAVIDSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Homestead $50001-$249999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED Event Code 4211-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CR: CASE MGMNT CONF CANCELLED Event Code 5738-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 10257-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 25814702
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 25814701
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
ASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES Event Code 10259-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT Event Code 11517-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25746854
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25716330
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.