Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Homestead $250000 & > |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22764647
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22764650
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22548354
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 22537183
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 2
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE BID SHEET Event Code 10020-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 22547649
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 4
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22529049
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS DOCUMENTARY EXHIBIT Event Code 10427-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26370214
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.