Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Homestead $50001-$249999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIG NOTE/MTG RETD PER ORDER Event Code 4991-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL MTG DOCS TO BE RETD Event Code 10109-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 10237-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22782678
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 2
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VACATE Event Code 2964-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22757928
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ASM: REOPEN CIRCUIT MOTION FEE Event Code 61-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VACATE Event Code 2964-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22751070
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21449302
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21449273
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.