Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLISA DAVIDSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Non-Homestd 50001-249999 |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION Event Code 6827-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26925851
Date: February 14, 2017ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23774728
Date: December 22, 2014ORDER DENYING PETITION OR MOTION Event Code 6282-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 25202182
Date: December 09, 2015REPORT OF MEDIATION Event Code 7433-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 25086189
Date: November 09, 2015AMENDED ORDER Event Code 6335-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24911536
Date: September 25, 2015ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 9957-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 25544651
Date: March 09, 2016ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 6255-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 25539890
Date: March 09, 2016MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code 2914-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25116882
Date: November 17, 2015MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 9761-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 25706101
Date: April 18, 2016ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL Event Code 6475-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 25122765
Date: November 16, 2015ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 25202232
Date: December 09, 2015MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 9761-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 25543070
Date: March 08, 2016NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION Event Code 6827-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 25739490
Date: April 21, 2016MOTION TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS Event Code 2929-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25148730
Date: November 30, 2015COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 20263697
Date: December 31, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
DSB: REFUND BOND Event Code 1124-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION Event Code 4129-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31013351
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION Event Code 6827-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26925851
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Event Code 5700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26730676
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26685717
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26634472
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS Event Code 2929-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 26621638
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.