Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLISA DAVIDSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Homestead $50001-$249999 |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION TO DISBURSE FROM REGISTRY OF COURT Event Code 9756-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 26601652
Date: November 23, 2016REQUEST Event Code 3016-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 25985196
Date: June 16, 2016REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25135514
Date: November 23, 2015MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE Event Code 3045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26678560
Date: December 14, 2016ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE Event Code 5596-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26736408
Date: January 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
ASM: DISB FORECLOSURE SURPLUS Event Code 9656-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
DSB: REFUND BOND Event Code 1124-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
DSB: REFUND BOND Event Code 1124-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
DSB: REFUND BOND Event Code 1124-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
ASM: DISB FORECLOSURE SURPLUS Event Code 9656-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DISBURSE FUNDS Event Code 6055-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26858910
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE Event Code 5596-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26736408
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.