Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Homestead $250000 & > |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
DSB: REFUND BOND Event Code 1124-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21582883
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21582885
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 5
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE BID SHEET Event Code 10020-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21505782
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 21507203
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 3
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21280752
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
May 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21278788
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.