Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with GEORGE W. MAXWELL III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Homestead $50001-$249999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED Event Code 4645-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIG NOTE/MTG RETD PER ORDER Event Code 4991-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE Event Code 7843-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20481999
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6209-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20482009
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS Event Code 2913-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20481983
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20470900
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20215185
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.