Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Non-Homestd 50001-249999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20487161
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20487156
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20457454
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 2
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 4
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20425119
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20224995
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20100271
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20078045
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.