Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Non-Homestead $0-$50000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIG NOTE/MTG RETD PER ORDER Event Code 4991-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21768081
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL MTG DOCS TO BE RETD Event Code 10109-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21682784
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21691580
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21684995
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.