Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grossman Renee, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cary Reed C, against Tramonte Dante, represented by Lanier Clinton W, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with GEORGE B. TURNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2012 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6209-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22119671
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Event Code 5348-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22078015
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT Event Code 6932-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21803428
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6959-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21791512
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6959-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21791492
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21639759
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21443098
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES Event Code 4946-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21236120
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.