Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with GEORGE W. MAXWELL III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2012 |
CategoryFcl-Non-Homestd 50001-249999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20225128
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20189565
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20189564
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20068570
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19920790
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19838529
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONDUCTED Event Code 4394-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.