Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Szilvasy Brian K, against Slocum Steve, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JEFFREY MAHL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY MAHL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19005191
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6229-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19005188
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18846194
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 18823596
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18823578
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18739211
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 2
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE Event Code 2138-Event Seq 1
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.