Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Szilvasy Brian K, against Dawson Christopher W, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ. PRESTON SILVERNAIL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19945417
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6229-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19945400
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19076972
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 2
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 18665961
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE Event Code 2138-Event Seq 1
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 5
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.