Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Debski Michael Thiel, Johnson Ryan Alan, against Matthews Penny L, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JEFFREY MAHL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6229-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19264193
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Event Code 6821-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19264046
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18796803
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18781844
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 18781845
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18665969
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18598301
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 18598340
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.