Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with MICHELLE A BAKER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHELLE A BAKER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
PLACED WITH LINEBARGER Event Code 10342-Event Seq 1
Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECALL CONFIRM COLLECTION AGY Event Code 9122-Event Seq 2
Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECALL REQ SUBM PENN CREDIT Event Code 9117-Event Seq 1
Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER |
|
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
PLACED PENN CREDIT COLLECTIONS Event Code 9102-Event Seq 1
Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
RECALL/ALO PRIMARY CONFIRMED Event Code 9276-Event Seq 1
Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER |
|
September 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
PLACED WITH ALO PRIMARY AGENCY Event Code 9264-Event Seq 1
Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
VITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED Event Code 9789-Event Seq 1
Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 17271722
Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5634-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 17271720
Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.