Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with GEORGE B. TURNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2010 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM RETURNED UNSERVED Event Code 7669-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31540275
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
ADMIN DISPOSED - NO ACTION Event Code 6622-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
January 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
TO BE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE TURNER AS OF 01-01-2019 Event Code 11695-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RETURNED UNSERVED Event Code 9994-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18104445
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
CR:ORD TO SHOW CAUSE CANCELLED Event Code 4311-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.