Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with TONYA B. RAINWATER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DESTRUCTION Event Code 6105-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31986873
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT BY CLERK TO DESTROY EXHIBITS Event Code 6102-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31876659
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION Event Code 6267-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24719088
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 2
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
REOPEN DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2803-Event Seq 1
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24641086
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24617736
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24607338
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.