Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with Robert Segal presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
CAL:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Event Code 3927-Event Seq 1
Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO APPEAR AND/OR SHOW CAUSE Event Code 6202-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 31180531
Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
REOPEN DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2803-Event Seq 1
Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 30937675
Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30864761
Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ |
|
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30750461
Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND ENFORCEMENT Event Code 9745-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30663197
Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.