Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JEFFREY MAHL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2006 |
CategoryReal Property/Mtg Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER DENYING PETITION OR MOTION Event Code 6282-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 10409692
Date: June 15, 2007MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 9588635
Date: January 08, 2007MOTION TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS Event Code 2929-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 15220243
Date: December 31, 2009REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 9401770
Date: November 27, 2006ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 13790251
Date: March 30, 2009REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 9698761
Date: January 29, 2007ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Event Code 6347-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 10633696
Date: July 30, 2007APPEAL TRANSMITTAL LETTER Event Code 4512-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 15481895
Date: February 24, 2010MOTION TO DISMISS Event Code 2913-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 13440625
Date: January 20, 2009MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 9761-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 14583624
Date: August 27, 2009ORDER DENYING PETITION OR MOTION Event Code 6282-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 15318136
Date: January 22, 2010MOTION TO VACATE Event Code 2964-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 14609340
Date: September 01, 2009MOTION TO SET ASIDE Event Code 2957-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 14507242
Date: August 12, 2009REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 9502073
Date: December 15, 2006MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 9761-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 14616350
Date: September 02, 2009ORDER DENYING PETITION OR MOTION Event Code 6282-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18373033
Date: October 19, 2011ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 6255-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 14577202
Date: August 25, 2009COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 9185153
Date: October 12, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING PETITION OR MOTION Event Code 6282-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18373033
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 2
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18140970
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 18015180
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 17748292
Judge: JEFFREY MAHL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.