Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryReal Property/Mtg Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 10246481
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 10092055
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 10091886
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 10030163
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 2
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 9852045
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 4
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 1276-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 9852466
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.