Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERT A WOHN JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryReal Property/Mtg Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 12481499
Date: July 15, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 14199992
Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR |
|
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 14199994
Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR |
|
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR |
|
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 14131527
Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR |
|
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 3
Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 14117510
Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR |
|
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 13987049
Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR |
|
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5648-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 13946129
Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR |
|
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 6
Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR |
|
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 13950076
Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.