Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Other Circuit Civil case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryOther Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DESTRUCTION Event Code 6105-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 12214090
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DESTRUCTION Event Code 6105-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 12214097
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT BY CLERK TO DESTROY EXHIBITS Event Code 6102-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 12049023
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT BY CLERK TO DESTROY EXHIBITS Event Code 6102-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 12049032
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
COPY Event Code 6806-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 9756414
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 9676465
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
WITNESS TESTIMONY LOG Event Code 7422-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 9674755
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
COURT MINUTES REGARDING MOTION HEARING Event Code 8261-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 9674188
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
FAXED COPY Event Code 6807-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 9649233
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.