Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sheppard, Anthony, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mccutchen, Ncrisha, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENT TO NEW TITLE IV-D CASE | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Income Deduction Order ORIGINAL INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY MAILED TO VITAL STATISTICS | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Child Support Guideline Worksheet | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - NO AGREEMENT | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE INVOICE FOR PROGRAM MEDIATION SERVICES | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Event NON JURY TRIAL scheduled on 5/30/2023 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.