Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Baker, Sabrina Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nelson, Jacques L, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER COMPELLING GENETIC TISSUE TYPING | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing 11/29/2023 AT 9AM | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 11/29/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JODI CASON presiding. | |
October 08, 2023 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RETURN JACQUES LOPEZ NELSON | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY AND TO SUPERSEDE AN ADMINISTRATIVE CHILD SUPPORT ORDER | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET (CS-ES15) | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: PAMELA A. SCHNEIDER | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT SHORT FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.