Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pennymac Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Abramson, Keith Lawrence, against Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignees, Mitchell, Sarah J, Mitchell, Zazhary V, Unknown Spouse Of Sarah J Mitc, Unknown Spouse Of Zazhary V Mi, (total of 7) See All represented by Taylor, James Jack, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 12, 2023COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: May 12, 2023Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: May 12, 2023SUMMONS
Date: May 12, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: May 12, 2023MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: May 12, 2023STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 12, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: May 15, 2023RESPONSE FILED BY SUSAN BARTON
Date: May 30, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: May 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ZAZHARY V. MIICHELL
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JAMES J TAYLOR JR
Date: June 22, 2023ANSWER DEFENDANT SARAH J MITCHELLS ANSWER
Date: June 22, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED CAYALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA
Date: May 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED SARAH J MITCHELL A/K/A SAILTIH JEANISE FLOWERS
Date: May 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED ZAZHARY V. MITCHELL
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: July 26, 2023LETTER RESPONSE FROM AGNES HILLIARD
Date: May 30, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: SARAH J MITCHELL A/K/A SARAH JEANISE FLOWERS 6/01/2023
Date: August 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ZACHARY V. MITCHELL
Date: August 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NKA AGNES HILLIARD 5/18/23
Date: August 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: ZAZHARY V. MITCHELL 8/16/2023
Date: August 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: CAVALRY SPV I LLC ON 5/23/2023
Date: August 15, 2023ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OR DISMISSAL AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 22, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT #2 5/18/2023
Date: August 15, 2023NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 04, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: October 04, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD, AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL
Date: October 04, 2023MTN FOR DEFAULT
Date: October 04, 2023DEFAULT ISSUED
Date: October 05, 2023DEFAULT
Date: October 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: November 01, 2023MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2023Notice of Filing ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT SARAH J MITCHELL N/K/A SARAH JEANISE FLOWERS
Date: November 08, 2023Notice of Filing (ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE)
Date: November 09, 2023Notice Of Hearing DECEMBER 20, 2023 AT 9AM
Date: November 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 12/20/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding. | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing DECEMBER 20, 2023 AT 9AM | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing (ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE) | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT SARAH J MITCHELL N/K/A SARAH JEANISE FLOWERS | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Sarah J Mitchell dismissed 11/8/2023 | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.