Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
121 Financial Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Reiss, Jennifer L, against Reed, Cassandra Lacheryl, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 20, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: HIDAY & RICKE
Date: December 20, 2019SUMMONS
Date: December 20, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 23, 2019ANSWER FILED BY CASSANDRA REED
Date: January 21, 2020ANSWER FILED BY CASSANDRA REED
Date: January 27, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: February 11, 2020Notice Of Hearing ON 3/17/20 @ 2:30PM
Date: March 06, 2020MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE
Date: March 06, 2020ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Date: March 11, 2020MOTION TO/FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING
Date: March 13, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2020Final Disposition Form
Date: April 16, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VYSTAR CREDIT UNION
Date: November 12, 2021MOTION FOR GARNISHMENT (AFTER JUDGMENT)
Date: November 17, 2021CLAIM OF EXEMPTION & REQUEST FOR HEARING CASSANDRA REED
Date: December 01, 2021MOTION JOINT MOTION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT
Date: December 28, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VYSTAR CREDIT UNION
Date: December 29, 2021COVER LETTER
Date: January 05, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT IN WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: January 06, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IN WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: February 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IN WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT IN WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSE | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VYSTAR CREDIT UNION | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION JOINT MOTION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLF'S AGENT ANSWERING AFFIDAVIT OF EXEMPTION | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY AND OTHER PROPERTY | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CLAIM OF EXEMPTION & REQUEST FOR HEARING CASSANDRA REED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.