Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rivers, Joseph L Jr, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Wynn, Chris, Taylor, Alex, Richter, Richard, Jones, Julie, represented by Braun, Jamie Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with PENA, PHILLIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePENA, PHILLIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT SIGNED | |
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event | FILED MAILED TO LEON COUNTY CLERK | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO LEON COUNTY WITH DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENTION OF TIME | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF TO CLERK | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.