Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Steele, David, Steele, Dewanda, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Davidson, Charles Brian, against Good2Go Roofing And Contracting Llc, represented by Schiffrin, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENRY, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiffs, David and Dewanda Steele, against the Defendant, Good2Go Roofing & Construction, LLC. The Plaintiffs are residents of Panama City, Bay County, Florida, and the Defendant is a for-profit corporation providing...
EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR DEFT
Date: August 27, 2021EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- GOOD2GO ROOFING
Date: August 19, 2021EP - ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION TO ABATE AND COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: February 17, 2022EP - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 21, 2022EP - DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 09, 2022EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ROYAL SCOTTS LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: January 10, 2022EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF DEWANDA STEELES LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTOMY
Date: January 10, 2022EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF CHAD DUDECK'S LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: January 10, 2022EP - TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 10, 2022EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF DAVID STEELE'S LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: January 10, 2022EP - TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION OF CHAD DUDECK
Date: January 03, 2022EP - TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION STEVE PASHOIAN
Date: January 03, 2022EP - TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION OF ROYAL SCOTT
Date: January 03, 2022EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 04, 2021EP - DEFTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF CHAD DUDECK'S LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: January 05, 2022EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF STEVE PASHOIAN'S LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: January 10, 2022EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 03, 2021EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 02, 2021EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 05, 2021EP - RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: January 06, 2022EP - DEFTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ROYAL SCOTT'S LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY
Date: January 05, 2022EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 29, 2021EP - TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION DEWANDA STEELE
Date: January 03, 2022EP - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 20, 2021EP - MOTION TO ABATE AND COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: September 13, 2021EP - COVER LETTER
Date: February 17, 2022EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 19, 2021EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2021EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 19, 2021EP - EXHIBIT A
Date: August 19, 2021EP - PLTS EXHIBIT B
Date: August 19, 2021EP - PLTS EXHIBIT D
Date: August 19, 2021EP - PLTS EXHIBIT C
Date: August 19, 2021STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: August 20, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021036526
Date: August 20, 2021EP - ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FOR DEFT GOOD2GO ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION , LLC
Date: August 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION TO ABATE AND COMPEL ARBITRATION | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 02/15/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN J/ , JDG: HENRY, WILLIAM | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ROYAL SCOTTS LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF DEWANDA STEELES LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTOMY | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF CHAD DUDECK'S LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF DAVID STEELE'S LIMITED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.