Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Origin At Seahaven Condominium Association, Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Barnhill, David D, against Certain Underwriters At Lloyds London, Certain Underwriters At Lloyds, London, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Starstone Speacilaity Insurance Company, represented by Genden, Andrew S, Kantro, Illon R, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Origin at Seahaven Condominium Association, Inc. against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. The plaintiff is a not-for-profit corporation based in Florida that owns a property in Bay County. The defendant insurer is a...
EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFT
Date: August 30, 2021EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 18, 2021EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 30, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021036283
Date: August 19, 2021EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 18, 2021EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 18, 2021EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 18, 2021STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: August 19, 2021EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS
Date: August 18, 2021EP - DFT STARSTONE SPECIALTY INS CO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: February 16, 2022EP - MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: February 16, 2022EP - DEFTS AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS-DEFTS
Date: January 11, 2022EP - DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: January 31, 2022EP - DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: January 10, 2022EP - ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO JOIN INDISPENSABLE PARTIES
Date: November 12, 2021EP - DFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: December 09, 2021EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- CERTIAN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON
Date: February 16, 2022EP - DFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: October 14, 2021EP - DFT SAFETY SPECIALTY INS CO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: February 16, 2022EP - COVER LETTER
Date: November 11, 2021EP - AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2021EP - DFTS MOTION TO STAY DISOVERY
Date: October 19, 2021EP - DFTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - STARSTONE SPECIALTY INS CO
Date: February 16, 2022EP - COVER LETTER
Date: December 06, 2021EP - DFTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT - SAFETY SPECIALTY INS CO
Date: February 16, 2022EP - DFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: September 20, 2021EP - MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DFTS
Date: October 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DFT STARSTONE SPECIALTY INS CO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- CERTIAN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DFT SAFETY SPECIALTY INS CO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING DISPOSITION OF DFTS MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENTON THE PLEADINGS | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - STARSTONE SPECIALTY INS CO | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT - SAFETY SPECIALTY INS CO | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS-DEFTS | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.