Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
An, Vatana, Chan, Boravy, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Pharis, Brandon Michael, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Lullove, Lisa S, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Vatana An and Boravy Chan against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract and demand a jury trial. The complaint states that the plaintiffs are Florida residents and the d...
EP - PLT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 02, 2021EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 02, 2021EP - PLT FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 02, 2021EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: August 02, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021033306
Date: August 02, 2021EP - RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 22, 2022EP - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 05, 2021EP - DEFTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 16, 2022EP - DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY
Date: September 08, 2021EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED
Date: August 24, 2021EP - NOTICE OF FILING CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 27, 2022EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFT
Date: September 02, 2021EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: October 04, 2021EP - DEFTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: September 02, 2021EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF FILING CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLTFS NOTICE OF FILING PERSUASIVE AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR NON COMPLIANCE | |
January 22, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 01/27/2022 AT 11:00 AM IN JC/ , JDG: GOODMAN, JAMES J JR | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE GOODMAN, JAMES J JR: ASSIGNED | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 01/27/2022 AT 11:00 AM IN A/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.