Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Barrata, Daniel J, Helms, Stacey L, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Haahr, Hans B, against Edison Insurance Company, represented by Horwitz, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Stacey L. Helms and Daniel J. Barrata, as Trustees of the William E. Crawford Revocable Trust, against Edison Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract damages. The complaint states that the plaintiffs own...
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 28, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021032524
Date: July 28, 2021EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2021EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 11, 2022EP - DEFT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 28, 2021EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 03, 2021EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 22, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 03, 2021EP - DEFT, EDISON INSURANCE CO. , NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 28, 2021EP - PLTFS DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND REPLY TO SEVENTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE
Date: September 14, 2021EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFT
Date: August 23, 2021EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: August 23, 2021EP - NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: September 13, 2021EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES--DEFT
Date: September 13, 2021STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: July 28, 2021EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- EDISON INS. COMPANY
Date: July 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE GOODMAN, JAMES J JR: ASSIGNED | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLTF DANIEL BARATTA'S VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFT, EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFT, EDISON INSURANCE CO. , NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.