Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Other Domestic Relations case in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GARCIA, ANA MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Domestic Relations |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER GRANTING DOMESTICATION OF FOREIGN ORDER - Recorded (OR.4470.1780. / 2021077112) | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JANICE STEGALL | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AGAINST RESPONDENT | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED- JANICE STEGALL TO RESPOND BY 9-8-21 | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF ACTION (TO BE ISSUED WHEN COPIES AND STAMPED ENVELOPE PROVIDED BY ATTORNEY - EMAIL SENT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.