Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sorrento, Natalie, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Bolton, Stephen F, against Allstate Insurance Company, represented by Sanders, Jerry D, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENRY, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Natalie Sorrento against Allstate Insurance Company in the Circuit Court in and for Bay County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that she was involved in an accident on November 12, 2015, while driving on US Highway 98 in Bay...
EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: February 28, 2020EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 02/04/2020 ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 06, 2020EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2020EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: February 19, 2021EP - PLTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 04, 2021EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 31, 2020EP - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL
Date: February 19, 2021EP - PLTS WITNESS LIST
Date: January 04, 2021EP - MEDIATION REPORT - IMPASSE
Date: January 04, 2021EP - DFTS THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: November 19, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT BY NATALIE SORRENTO TO DEFENDANT
Date: August 18, 2020EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: November 18, 2020EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTY. STEPHEN BOLTON FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: June 23, 2020EP - CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY
Date: November 17, 2020EP - DEFTS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 04, 2021EP - NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION
Date: July 24, 2020EP - DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: April 16, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS
Date: April 16, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 27, 2020EP - ALLSTATE'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 09, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 09, 2020EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: July 20, 2020EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 27, 2020EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FOR ALLSTATE
Date: February 28, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: April 16, 2020EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE- 12/21/20 AT 8:30
Date: November 12, 2020EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 23, 2020EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 31, 2020EP - DFTS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLT
Date: July 20, 2020EP - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 31, 2020PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020005646
Date: January 31, 2020EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 31, 2020EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | RESULT FOR : CIVIL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/22/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN TBA/ , JDG: OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C : DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4365.1945. / 2021012085) | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS WITNESS LIST | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MEDIATION REPORT - IMPASSE | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.