Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Christensen, Jarae, Christensen, Michael, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Duboff, Kenneth R, against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Bonfanti, Michael L, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMILEY, ELIJAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Michael Christensen and Jarae Christensen against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company in the Circuit Court in and for Bay County, Florida. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $30,000. The plaintiffs are...
EP - ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH GUIDELINES FOR PROFFESSIONAL CONDUCT
Date: April 15, 2021EP - AGREED ORDER ON DFTS MOTION TO QUASH PLTFS REQ FOR DEPOSITION
Date: April 14, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 20, 2020EP - DFTS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS FO THE PLTS
Date: January 15, 2021EP - JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: September 10, 2021EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: January 14, 2021EP - NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: April 13, 2021EP - ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED
Date: July 13, 2020EP - AGREED ORDER DENYING PTFS MTN TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE
Date: September 08, 2020EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: January 21, 2021EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 31, 2020EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE
Date: January 31, 2020EP - AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4460.481. / 2021070363)
Date: September 10, 2021EP - ORDER ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 14, 2021EP - COVER LETTER
Date: September 10, 2021EP - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: February 14, 2021EP - DEFTS REPLY TO PLTS NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: April 13, 2021EP - ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION
Date: April 15, 2021EP - ORDER SETTING CAUSE FOR TRIAL BY JURY- 1/24/22
Date: April 14, 2021EP - COVER LETTER
Date: April 14, 2021EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 08/10/21 @ 1:30PM
Date: July 08, 2021EP - COVER LETTER
Date: September 08, 2020EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 04/14/21 @ 8:30 AM CST
Date: February 03, 2021EP - DEFT MOTION TO DETERMINE THE SEQUENCE OF DEPOSITIONS
Date: January 05, 2021EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 31, 2020EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 22, 2020EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 06, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 22, 2020EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: October 01, 2020EP - COVER LETTER
Date: July 13, 2020EP - MOTION TO STRIKE- PLTFS
Date: August 11, 2020EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 20, 2021EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 10/02/2020 @ 10;30 A.M.
Date: August 26, 2020EP - UNITED PROPERTY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 20, 2020EP - UNITED PROPERY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 20, 2020EP - NOTICE OF FILING EXECUTED JURAT PAGE
Date: November 02, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 31, 2020EP - DFTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLT
Date: April 03, 2020EP - NOTICE OF FILING INSURANCE POLICY
Date: May 06, 2020EP - MOTION TO DISMISS- FILED BY UNITED INS CO
Date: March 25, 2020EP - NOTICE OF HEARING VIA AUDIO
Date: May 13, 2020EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 31, 2020PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020005554
Date: January 31, 2020EP - DFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS
Date: April 20, 2020EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: May 04, 2020EP - DFTS NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTS
Date: April 03, 2020EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 31, 2020EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2020EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE- SETTLED
Date: August 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | RESULT FOR : CIVIL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/24/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN TBA/ , JDG: SMILEY, ELIJAH : CASE DISMISSED | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4460.481. / 2021070363) | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE- SETTLED | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 08/10/21 @ 1:30PM | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH GUIDELINES FOR PROFFESSIONAL CONDUCT | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - AGREED ORDER ON DFTS MOTION TO QUASH PLTFS REQ FOR DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.