Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pembleton, Anita, Pembleton, Ishmeal, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Rosso, Scott M, against Security First Insurance Company, represented by Richardson, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Ishmael and Anita Pembleton against Security First Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $30,000, exclusive of interest, attorneys' fees, and costs. The plaintiffs and the defendant entered into...
EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 09/30/2020 @ 11;00 A.M.
Date: August 06, 2020EP - COVER LETTER
Date: October 02, 2020EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 09/30/20 @ 11:00 AM
Date: September 30, 2020EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: April 09, 2021EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION
Date: February 11, 2021EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: November 13, 2020EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: January 20, 2020EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE SCOPE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 05, 2020EP - DFTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 21, 2020EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- SECURITY 1ST INS CO
Date: June 26, 2020EP - DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: June 05, 2020EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE
Date: January 20, 2020EP - SECURITY FIRST'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: June 05, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 05, 2020EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2020PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020003617
Date: January 21, 2020EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 20, 2020EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 20, 2020EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 20, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 20, 2020EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 20, 2020EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 20, 2020EP - DFTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 21, 2020EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 02, 2020EP - COVER LETTER
Date: May 27, 2020EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: October 06, 2020EP - AGREED ORDER ON PLTS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS
Date: October 02, 2020EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOP JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: March 19, 2020EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 19, 2020EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 05/27/2020
Date: May 26, 2020EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS
Date: August 04, 2020EP - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 19, 2020EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY
Date: April 15, 2020EP - NOTICE OF HEARING- 5/27/20 AT 1 PM
Date: April 20, 2020EP - SECURITY FIRST'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 13, 2020EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND- SECURITY FIRST INS CO
Date: February 17, 2020EP - COVER LETTER
Date: February 18, 2020EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 01/28/2020 SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - AGREED ORDER ON PLTS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 09/30/20 @ 11:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.