Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hudson, Jeralene, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mattox, Marie A, against Lhp Bay County Llc, Sacred Heart Health Systems Inc, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2019 |
CategoryDiscrimination Employment/Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
This complaint is filed by Jeralene Hudson against LHP Bay County, LLC in the Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The complaint alleges violations of § 448.101 et seq. of the Florida Statutes. The action involves ...
PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019048278
Date: September 03, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 30, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 30, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEMS INC
Date: August 30, 2019EP - AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO US DISTRICT COURT | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019048278 | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE FISHEL, JOHN L II: ASSIGNED | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MATTOX, MARIE A ASSIGNED | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - SACRED HEART HEALTH SYSTEMS INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.