Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Estate Of Angelina H Calvert, Hicks, Cynthia Ann, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Smith, Kimesha S, against Tower Hill Select Insurance Company, represented by Fluet, Nicole M, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Cynthia Ann Hicks as the personal representative of the estate of Angelina H. Calvert against Tower Hill Select Insurance Company. The complaint alleges breach of contract arising from an insurance policy issued by the defe...
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 28, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 28, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 28, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - TOWER HILL SELECT INS CO
Date: August 28, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 28, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019047557
Date: August 28, 2019EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 28, 2019EP - PROOF OF SERVICE 08/30/2019 TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, SCOTT ROWE
Date: August 30, 2019EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2019EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY
Date: October 14, 2019EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - TOWER HILL SELECT
Date: October 09, 2019EP - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FOR TOWER HILL
Date: October 14, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 14, 2019EP - TOWER HILL'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: November 14, 2019EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REP 04/01/2020 @ 1;00 P.M.
Date: December 02, 2019EP - DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 31, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 31, 2020EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DFTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS
Date: March 02, 2020EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 30, 2020EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: September 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DFTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REP 04/01/2020 @ 1;00 P.M. | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - TOWER HILL'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.