Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Target General Contracting Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Wangelin, Lisa Rae, Wangelin, Stephen, represented by Rojas-Colucci, Candice A, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2019 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Target General Contracting Corp. against Stephen Wangelin and Lisa Wangelin. The plaintiff is seeking damages exceeding $15,000. The plaintiff is a Florida corporation and licensed general contractor, while the defendants a...
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 28, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- LISA WANGELIN
Date: August 28, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- STEPHEN WANGELIN
Date: August 28, 2019PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2019047553
Date: August 28, 2019EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUMMONS 8/30/19 - STEPHEN WANGELIN
Date: September 19, 2019EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTY. CANDICE ROJAS-COLUCCI FOR DEFENDANT
Date: September 19, 2019EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 29, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- PLTFS
Date: October 29, 2019EP - MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DFT LISA WANGELIN
Date: October 30, 2019EP - MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DFT STEPHEN WANGELIN
Date: October 30, 2019EP - ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS - STEVEN AND LISA WANGELIN
Date: December 18, 2019EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: December 31, 2019EP - TARGET'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 13, 2020PAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2019068235
Date: December 18, 2019EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 17, 2020EP - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 23, 2020DFTS NOTICE OF SERVING OF RESPONSES TO PLTS DISCOVERY
Date: May 05, 2020EP - MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUSEL FOR PLTF
Date: August 08, 2020EP - AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR CASE NUMBER CORRECTION
Date: August 10, 2020EP - MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Date: August 17, 2020EP - ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONE APPEARANCE 10/22/2020
Date: August 17, 2020EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 10/22/2020 @ 3;30 P.M.
Date: August 18, 2020EP - ORDER AUTHORIZING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR PLTF
Date: October 27, 2020EP - STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 17, 2021EP - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME- DFTS
Date: December 16, 2020EP - DEFTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT
Date: November 01, 2021EP - DEFTS AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: July 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE HENRY, WILLIAM: ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION K ASSIGNED | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME- DFTS | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER AUTHORIZING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR PLTF | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 10/22/2020 AT 3:30 PM IN JC/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 10/22/2020 @ 3;30 P.M. | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.