Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Palm Pcb Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by O'Malley, Timothy, against American Integrity Insurance Company Of America, represented by Diener, Erik D, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by PALM PCB, L.L.C. against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant, an insurance company authorized to do business in Florida, breached their contract of insurance. The plaint...
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 20, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 20, 2019EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR AMERICAN INTEGRITY
Date: February 06, 2020EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 13, 2020EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE
Date: August 20, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 20, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 20, 2019EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: September 13, 2019EP - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 21, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: March 16, 2020EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: May 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 02/26/2020 @ 2:15 P.M. | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 02/26/2020 AT 2:15 PM IN JC/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR AMERICAN INTEGRITY | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: O'MALLEY, TIMOTHY ASSIGNED | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.