Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cummings, Christopher, Cummings, Muriel, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Gimenez, Angel, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Diocares, Jonathan Marc, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Christopher Cummings, acting as the attorney in fact for Muriel Cummings, against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that the defendant, Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Compan...
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 12, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 12, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 12, 2019EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 12, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 12, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019044602
Date: August 13, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO
Date: August 12, 2019EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 21, 2019EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY
Date: September 27, 2019EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 24, 2019EP - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY
Date: October 09, 2019EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY
Date: December 04, 2019EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 03/25/2020 @ 12;30 P.M.
Date: February 25, 2020EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 03/25/2020 @ 12:30 P.M.
Date: February 25, 2020EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 24, 2020EP - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY
Date: March 13, 2020EP - COVER LETTER
Date: March 13, 2020EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: March 25, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OBJECTIONS & ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 24, 2020EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS
Date: June 10, 2020EP - DFTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 05, 2020EP - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY - ATTY. BIJAL PATEL
Date: June 05, 2020EP - NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL
Date: July 24, 2020EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM RYAN RIGGS 02/10/21 @ 10:00 AM
Date: July 09, 2020EP - ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/04/2020 @ 3;45 P.M.
Date: July 30, 2020EP - COVER LETTER
Date: August 07, 2020EP - ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION
Date: August 07, 2020EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: August 18, 2020EP - UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY/PRETRIAL - 04/26/21
Date: August 19, 2020EP - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ATTY
Date: September 08, 2020EP - DFTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 11, 2020EP - DFTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLT
Date: September 15, 2020EP - DFTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLT
Date: September 15, 2020EP - NOTICE OF FILING DFTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLT
Date: September 15, 2020EP - MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS & COMPEL BETTER ANSWERS TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS
Date: September 21, 2020EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DFTS CORPORATE REP
Date: September 28, 2020EP - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME
Date: November 10, 2020EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 29, 2020EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: December 02, 2020EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 10, 2020EP - PLTFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: November 15, 2020EP - PLTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 02, 2021EP - PLTS RESPONSES TO DFTS INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 02, 2021EP - PLTS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 04, 2021EP - DFTS MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: February 12, 2021EP - DEFT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF RECORD ATTORNEY AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: February 10, 2021EP - DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 19, 2021EP - DEFT'S WITNESS LIST
Date: February 19, 2021EP - DFTS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: February 19, 2021EP - COVER LETTER
Date: February 25, 2021EP - DEFT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FILE DISCLOSURE FOR EXPERT WITNESS
Date: February 19, 2021EP - NOTICE OF CONSENT TO CONTINUNCE OF TRIAL
Date: February 25, 2021EP - ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: February 25, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: February 26, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFT'S FIRST SET OF EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 04, 2021EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE- 3/17/21 AT 2 PM
Date: March 05, 2021EP - NOTICE OF FILING DEFT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTS EXPERTS
Date: March 04, 2021EP - CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY
Date: March 15, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT VIA MEDIATION
Date: March 18, 2021EP - MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLEMENT
Date: March 18, 2021EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: July 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT VIA MEDIATION | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLEMENT | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE- 3/17/21 AT 2 PM | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFT'S FIRST SET OF EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF FILING DEFT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTS EXPERTS | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.