Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mashburn, Angela, Mashburn, Douglas Jr, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Rosso, Scott M, against Fednat Insurance Company, represented by Zimmern, Benjamin Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Douglas Mashburn, Jr. and Angela Mashburn against Defendant FedNat Insurance Company. The Plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of interest, attorneys' fees, and costs. The Plaintiffs and...
EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: August 09, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 09, 2019EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: August 09, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 09, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 09, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 09, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLEMENT | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REP AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 03/13/2020 @ 9:00 A.M. | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - RE-NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REP 03/16/2020 @ 10:00 A.M. EST | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REP 03/02/2020 @ 10;00 A.M. EST | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.