Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kiser, Jennifer, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Moskowitz, Laurence, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Litman, Lance, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Jennifer Kiser against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of court costs, attorney's fees, and interest. The plaintiff is a resident of Bay Coun...
EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 07, 2019EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - 11/18/20 @ 8:30AM
Date: October 13, 2020EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED
Date: November 18, 2020EP - REQUEST
Date: August 07, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019043800
Date: August 08, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 07, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 07, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS
Date: August 07, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 07, 2019EP - ANSWER- UNIVERSAL INS CO
Date: October 02, 2019EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: October 02, 2019EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 02, 2019EP - UNSIGNED PRETRIAL ORDER
Date: August 18, 2020EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 02, 2019EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 08/18/2020 @ 10:45 A.M.
Date: May 12, 2020EP - ORDER REMOVING CAUSE FROM TRIAL DOCKET
Date: November 18, 2020EP - NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL
Date: May 11, 2020EP - ORDER GRANTING PLTS MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE ON 08/18/20 @ 10:45 AM CT
Date: May 13, 2020EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Date: May 21, 2020EP - ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE IS GRANTED
Date: May 27, 2020EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: January 14, 2021EP - PLT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT FOR INTEREST AND FOR ATTY'S FEE AND COSTS
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT FOR INTEREST AND FOR ATTY'S FEE AND COSTS | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | RESULT FOR : CIVIL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/21/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN TBA/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II : SETTLED/DISPOSED BEFORE HEARING | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER REMOVING CAUSE FROM TRIAL DOCKET | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - 11/18/20 @ 8:30AM | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/21/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN TBA/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - UNSIGNED PRETRIAL ORDER | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY 06/21/2021 @ 9;00 A.M.; AND PRETRIAL 05/03/2021 @ 10;00 A.M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.